EPPING ST JOHN'S PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise monies to benefit the education of children on roll at Epping St John's C of E VC School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 January 2013: Re-registered
- ST JOHN'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Janes | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Elson | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.25k | £4.09k | £2.66k | £2.36k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.03k | £4.04k | £1.33k | £2.35k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ENCOURAGING THE FULLEST CO-OPERATION BETWEEN HOME AND SCHOOL, THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY , AND ALL OTHER INTRESTED PERSONS AND BODIES IN THE AREA OF WEST ESSEX.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Epping St John's School
Bury Lane
EPPING
CM16 5JB
- Phone:
- 01992573028
- Email:
- yerosimoum@bmatesj.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window