Accounts and annual returns SUDDEN DEATH SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1045905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2009 02 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2008 07 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2007 06 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 Not Required