VICTORY CHRISTIAN CENTRE RUGELEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VICTORY CHRISTIAN CENTRE IS AN ESTABLISHED CHURCH WHICH HAS APPROXIMATELY 90 MEMBERS, WHO IN TURN CONTRIBUTE TO THE WELLBEING OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND SUPPORTIVE OF OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AROUND THE WORLD. VCC IS ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN A NUMBER OF MISSIONARY PROJECTS AND INSTITUTIONS AND PROMOTES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS A LIFESTYLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £7,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 20 April 1995: Standard registration
- 27 June 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 27 June 2019: Funds transferred to 1183524 VICTORY CHURCH - RUGELEY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.19k | £67.02k | £58.84k | £57.32k | £59.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.16k | £67.02k | £49.72k | £62.16k | £59.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 06 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
06 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 February 2017 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
06 February 2017 | 6 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (2) RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK (3) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window