CRICH GLEBE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall/community centre providing services for Crich and surrounding villages, including catering, accommodation for early years learning, medical services, society meetings and lectures, church and parish council meetings, rooms for wellbeing activities and village events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,561 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 April 1995: Standard registration
- Crich Glebe Community Centre (Working name)
- CRICH GLEBE FIELD TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Auld | Chair | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew John Penson | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Noel Walsh | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Eric Philip Dolby | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.89k | £118.78k | £94.88k | £89.04k | £108.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.11k | £101.24k | £112.41k | £112.41k | £132.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £100.80k | £48.30k | £9.99k | £11.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 03 APR 2025
Charitable objects
A.THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY BY PROVISION OF A DAY CARE CENTRE AND FACILITIES FOR THE CARE OF THE ELDERLY INFIRM AND CHRONICALLY SICK SO AS TO AFFORD RESPITE AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH OF THOSE PERSONS WHO CARE FOR THEM ON A PERMANENT BASIS. B.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CRICH AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. C.THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY AND OF YOUNG DISABLED PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTERED ACCOMODATION.
Area of benefit
CRICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRICH GLEBE COMMUNITY CENTRE
GLEBE FIELD CLOSE
CRICH
MATLOCK
DE4 5EU
- Phone:
- 01773857894
- Email:
- office@crichglebe.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window