SEABRIDGE COMMUNITY EDUCATION CENTRE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 April 1995: Standard registration
- 27 June 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.03k | £35.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.90k | £30.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 16 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 16 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 21 June 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 21 June 2005 | 21 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 26 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window