Trustees Brighter Bunnies Pre School Playgroup
Charity number: 1045977

Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
debra parr | Chair | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
charlotte chadwick | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Crossley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID HOUGHTON | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JOHNSON | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
sandra simm Mrs | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.