Financial history RUFFORTH C P SCHOOL P T A

Charity Number: 1045997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.77k £262 £3.27k £2.59k £4.01k
Total expenditure £4.46k £6.70k £4.08k £3.78k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A