Financial history DISABILITY AND DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS

Charity number: 1046001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.16k £188.49k £150.33k £92.43k £166.66k
Total expenditure £262.24k £200.55k £117.49k £122.06k £186.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.97k £62.57k £33.04k N/A N/A