NORTHAMPTON CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1046006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Care and rehoming of domestic cats and kittens.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £120
Total expenditure: £4,239

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
amanda Usher Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
MR BILL MALIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £25 £180 £180 £210 £120
Total expenditure £4.25k £2.31k £2.76k £1.26k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORTHAMPTON CAT RESCUE
43 BAKER STREET
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 6DH
Phone:
01604712760
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available