Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE MERTON AND LAMBETH

Charity number: 1046018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.02m £1.23m £1.23m £1.28m £1.28m
Total expenditure £933.44k £1.13m £1.18m £1.26m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £690.14k £705.95k £715.76k £864.08k £1.09m
Income from government grants £20.00k £206.27k £95.00k £204.00k £166.90k
Income - Donations and legacies £41.80k £76.61k £78.67k £81.13k £77.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £979.85k £1.15m £1.15m £1.20m £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £669 £180 £43 £1.86k £3.36k
Income - Other £0 £9 £773 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £930.81k £1.08m £1.17m £1.26m £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.63k £2.74k £3.67k £3.91k £4.79k
Expenditure - Governance £13.97k £11.74k £11.74k £11.12k £7.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £53.99k £0 £0 £0