Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY OF WARWICK SCIENCE PARK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1046020
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 10 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required