BUILDING APPEAL FOR SYTCHAMPTON SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 May 1995: Standard registration
- 14 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- B A S S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING SYTCHAMPTON ENDOWED FIRST SCHOOL (THE SCHOOL) AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ASSIST THE GOVERNORS TO PAY THEIR CONTRIBUTION TO THE COST OF NEW BUILDINGS
Area of benefit
SYTCHAMPTON FIRST SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window