THAMESIDE SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Beavers, Cubs and Scouts meet weekly for a range of opportunities and balanced programme that scouting provide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,394 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Thurrock
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM TIDMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Clarke | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Taylor | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|||||
BRETT ROGERS | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAN TIDMAN | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE ROGERS | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|||||
TERRY MEAD | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.20k | £9.45k | £6.06k | £9.52k | £13.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.33k | £6.80k | £6.30k | £12.44k | £21.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Belmont Village Hall
Parker Road
GRAYS
Essex
RM17 5YW
- Phone:
- 07745642083
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window