Financial history THE CHANGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1046047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £989.61k £1.06m £1.33m £1.35m £1.38m
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.06m £1.35m £1.36m £1.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £92.66k N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants N/A £150.44k £92.66k £20.00k £5.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £71.54k £265.36k £158.80k £179.26k £172.90k
Income - Other trading activities £196.71k £63.61k £369.96k £353.68k £305.40k
Income - Charitable activities £719.98k £730.55k £799.05k £812.31k £874.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.38k £209 £51 £2.02k £22.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £804.91k £824.19k £1.21m £1.04m £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £304.47k £239.45k £140.35k £318.99k £220.34k
Expenditure - Governance £14.40k £14.40k £15.60k £4.98k £782
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0