Financial history CRESSAGE SCHOOL P T A

Charity Number: 1046078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 19/09/2022 19/09/2023
Total gross income £9.70k £3.46k £1.10k £4.81k £3.63k
Total expenditure £6.41k £4.98k £3.03k £4.27k £832
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A