LINCOLN EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church provides financial support for christian workers, in addition to its own pastor, in both the UK and in a number of overseas countries. Financial and practical support is also allocated to the care of families and children, and to the disadvantaged as well as relief for those affected by disasters.This is done through appropriate agencies. Spiritual help is offered throughout
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David Thomson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MILLER | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW TIMOTHY WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.88k | £150.87k | £114.07k | £61.00k | £63.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.14k | £110.45k | £159.78k | £61.64k | £62.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION (2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Area of benefit
LINCOLN AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincoln Evangelical Church
Uffington Close
LINCOLN
LN6 0AE
- Phone:
- 01522871899
- Email:
- woodandrew273@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window