GROVE PARK COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide community facilities for people in the Grove Park area of the Borough of Lewisham, south east London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lewisham
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
- RINGWAY - G P C G (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair James Walter | Chair | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ben Mark Donaldson | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Sylvia Moore | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John David Edkins | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Kate Legouix | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Woods | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sonja Kristina Aldengard | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.96k | £72.44k | £91.80k | £89.58k | £87.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.61k | £69.84k | £105.99k | £91.10k | £122.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.98k | £20.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GROVE PARK AND SOUTH LEE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT)WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH,OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GROVE PARK AND SOUTH LEE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
268 BARING ROAD
LONDON
SE12 0DS
- Phone:
- 02088577980
- Email:
- info@gpcg.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window