THE NATIONAL DRAGONFLY MUSEUM AT ASHTON MILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raising awareness of the the beauty, intrinsic interest and plight of dragonflies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- Derbyshire
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Norfolk
- Peterborough City
- Rutland
- Somerset
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
- 03 May 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NATIONAL DRAGONFLY MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL DRAGONFLY MUSEUM/THE DRAGONFLY PROJECT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.60k | £2.11k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.99k | £4.82k | £2.08k | £1.55k | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 19 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 14 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 29 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD NOVEMBER 1994.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,BY ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF DRAGON FLIES AND THEIR NATURAL HABITAT AND PROMOTE THEIR CONSERVATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM: TO ADVANCE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE RENOVATION OF AND PRESERVATION OF ASHTON MILL,PETERBOROUGH,BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE AND TO DISPLAY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EXHIBITS WHICH DEMONSTRATE ANCIENT CRAFTS AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE PETERBOROUGH CAMBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window