VECTIS ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides an observatory facility and astronomy related educational events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 27 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bryn Davis | Chair | 25 February 2013 |
|
|||||
ELAINE SPEAR FBDO | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD FLUX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN JOHN CURD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY BATES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £1.03k | £1.49k | £2.26k | £1.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.64k | £901 | £1.50k | £1.60k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1995, AS AMENDED 22 AUGUST 2003 AND 22 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND ALLIED SCIENCES, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC INTEREST THEREIN AND TO PROVIDE AN ASTRONOMICAL OBSERVATORY FOR USE IN CONNECTION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vectis Astronomical Society
Watery Lane
Newchurch
Isle of Wight
PO36 0LX
- Phone:
- 07594 339950
- Email:
- secretary@wightastronomy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window