JOSEPH ROWNTREE SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to advance the education of the students and staff of Joseph Rowntree School and of the wider community by providing or assisting in the provision of educational, recreational and other charitable facilities undertaken by Joseph Rowntree School not normally provided by the local Education Authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GOVERNORS OF JOSEPH ROWNTREE SCHOOL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.86k | £81.01k | £87.92k | £87.53k | £267.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.88k | £135.19k | £86.03k | £76.03k | £246.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 1995 AND 02 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND STAFF OF THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE SCHOOL AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF: A) EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES UNDERTAKEN BY THE JOSEPH ROWNTREE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY; AND/OR B) EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES FOR THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 2) PROVIDING SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF MEMBERS OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Holmfield Drive
LEEDS
LS8 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01904552100
- Email:
- joseph.rowntree@york.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window