EAST ANGLIAN SAILING FOR PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"For the relief of persons with disabilities in the area of benefit and to educate such persons through the provision of sailing and sailing related instruction and experience including the provision of a centre to give such experience and training in sailing and seamanship for such persons using Royal Yachting Association qualified instructors and facilities and the organisation of winter courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,958 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 April 1995: Standard registration
- 20 March 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1210807 THE WOOLVERSTONE SAILABILITY PROJECT
- THE WOOLVERSTONE PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.46k | £24.80k | £48.08k | £39.12k | £55.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.42k | £24.38k | £35.24k | £57.24k | £46.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £3.75k | £18.00k | £4.37k | £2.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 APRIL 1995 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 13 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES IN EAST ANGLIA AND TO EDUCATE SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION SAILING OR SAILING RELATED FACILITIES INSTRUCTION AND EXPERIENCE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE TO GIVE SUCH EXPERIENCE AND TRAINING IN SAILING AND SEAMANSHIP FOR SUCH PERSONS USING ROYAL YACHTING ASSOCIATION QUALIFIED INSTRUCTORS AND FACILITIES AND THE ORGANISATION OF WINTER COURSES AND LECTURES FOR SUCH PERSONS COVERING SAILING IN ITS WIDEST APPLICATION TO INCLUDE NAVIGATION BOATWORK AND CRUISING KNOWLEDGE LEADING TO ENHANCED SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL SKILLS CONFIDENCE BUILDING AND SELF ESTEEM
Area of benefit
EAST ANGLIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window