Governing document CLIFTON CAMPVILLE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1046105

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24 MARCH 1971 AS VARIED BY LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 1985 as amended on 05 Jun 2014 as amended on 22 Jun 2021 as amended on 30 Aug 2023 as amended on 26 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CLIFTON CAMPVILLE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF CLIFTON CAMPVILLE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.