MUSIC PLATFORM LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music Platform, trading as English Pocket Opera Company and Children's Music Workshop, uses singing and opera by, with and for children, to inspire childrenÔÇÖs creativity. With cross-curricular programmes tailored to individual school/community requirements its programmes seek to achieve broad educational and social impact and build capacity for long-term sustainability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 April 1995: Standard registration
- 20 December 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ENGLISH POCKET OPERA COMPANY (Working name)
- POCKET OPERA COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE CAMBERWELL POCKET OPERA COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/10/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £438.38k | £207.55k | £275.64k | £453.91k | £159.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £461.44k | £186.04k | £467.33k | £322.56k | £124.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 19 December 2011 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 19 December 2011 | 110 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 06 July 2010 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 28 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 06 July 2010 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 06 July 2010 | 371 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 FEBRUARY 1995, 5TH DECEMBER 1996 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 30 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN GENERAL AND THE OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF DRAMATIC ART BY PROVIDING, PRESENTING AND ORGANISING MANAGING AND CONDUCTING PERFORMANCES OF CLASSICAL AND CONTEMPORARY OPERAS OF CULTURAL VALUE TO SCHOOLS AND THE COMMUNITY IN ALL PARTS OF THE BRITISH ISLES AND TO ENCOURAGE THE CREATION OF OPERA AND DRAMATIC ART GENERALLY; 2. THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR STUDENTS OF PROMISE AND ABILITY TO EXTEND THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE AND TRAIN THEM IN ALL BRANCHES OF OPERATIC PRODUCTION AND STAGE CRAFT;
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window