Accounts and annual returns ARTHUR TERRY P T A

Charity number: 1046196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 November 2024 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 December 2022 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 January 2021 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required