FRIENDS OF ROSIE CHILDRENS CANCER RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to fund and promote research into the causes, distribution, symptoms, pathology and treatment of cancer in children and to disseminate the results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 May 1995: Standard registration
- Children's Cancer Research Fund (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ROSIE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hickman PhD | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carla Nuttall | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina London | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Crosby | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Craig Rea | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mahesh Vara | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Dowdall | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY GOODEY C B E | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE THERESA MOGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.47k | £44.15k | £18.80k | £80.73k | £79.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.37k | £87.06k | £40.87k | £88.77k | £119.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 1995
Charitable objects
TO FUND AND OTHERWISE PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DISTRIBUTION, SYMPTOMS, PATHOLOGY AND TREATMENT OF CANCER IN CHILDREN AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF THE CAUSES, DISTRIBUTION, SYMPTOMS, PATHOLOGY AND TREATMENT OF CANCER IN CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slater Heelis Llp
86 Deansgate
MANCHESTER
M3 2ER
- Phone:
- 01619693131
- Email:
- info@friendsofrosie.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window