Accounts and annual returns GROUNDWORK MANCHESTER

Charity number: 1046299
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 25 May 2006 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 16 May 2005 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 February 2005 25 days late