Accounts and annual returns BEIS MENACHEM CHABAD LUBAVITCH

Charity number: 1046309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 February 2025 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 21 February 2025 327 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window