BEIS MENACHEM CHABAD LUBAVITCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FURTHERENCE OF ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 11 May 1995: Standard registration
- BEIS MENACHEM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI JOSEF AKIVA COHEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
RALPH WEIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DAVID HICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.97k | £86.45k | £140.70k | £437.54k | £403.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.48k | £84.54k | £144.94k | £190.67k | £488.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
FURTHERENCE OF ORTHODOX JEWISH EDUCATION, RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEIS MENACHEM
PARK LANE
SALFORD
M7 4JD
- Phone:
- 03003020132
- Email:
- rabbi@beismenachem.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window