Accounts and annual returns THE DALE TRUST (ANDOVER DRUGS ADVISORY SERVICE) LTD

Charity number: 1046316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 12 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 24 March 2005 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 27 September 2004 On Time