CHARLES FLINT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefit 6 poor scholars at Hartington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Hawton | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Adrian Crowe | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £686 | £769 | £586 | £1.50k | £83 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £70 | £70 | £70 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1853
Charitable objects
IN AND TOWARDS THE EDUCATION AND PROVIDING BOOKS AND OTHER ARTICLES OF EDUCATION AND FOR SIX POOR CHILDREN OF THE TOWNSHIP OF HARTINGTON OR ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
HARTINGTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Giles Church
Drury Lane
Biggin
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 0DL
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window