Accounts and annual returns THE WINDSOR HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1046326
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 10 July 2016 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 10 July 2016 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2013 21 October 2014 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required