Accounts and annual returns THE HARROGATE PHOENIX PLAYERS

Charity Number: 1046335
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required