Financial history THE HARROGATE PHOENIX PLAYERS

Charity number: 1046335
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 15/09/2022
Total gross income £30.34k £19.23k £21.51k £1.00k £35.86k
Total expenditure £28.08k £30.30k £20.65k £1.19k £29.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A