Financial history THE PROJECT FOR BOLIVIA

Charity number: 1046345
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £12.32k £8.09k £9.28k £2.16k £1.39k
Total expenditure £10.66k £10.84k £8.27k £1.26k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A