HIDDEN TREASURES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 12 May 1995: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S BLUECOAT SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA TURNER | Chair | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Broster | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE UNDERHILL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.38k | £85.28k | £103.05k | £84.31k | £92.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.25k | £83.54k | £95.60k | £88.26k | £94.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £72.13k | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2024 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2024 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 January 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 January 2021 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 January 2021 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
BRIDGNORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLCREST
COALPORT ROAD
MADELEY
TELFORD
TF7 5DS
- Phone:
- 01746767444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window