Accounts and annual returns ST. HILARY'S NURSERY SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1046371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 July 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 July 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 June 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 June 2021 22 days late Download Open in new window