Financial history ST. HILARY'S NURSERY SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1046371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £80.23k £86.28k £121.20k £134.15k £148.57k
Total expenditure £72.96k £85.87k £118.71k £138.48k £140.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £74.19k N/A N/A £93.89k £136.32k