ST. HILARY'S NURSERY SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raffles-sponsors-school plays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £136,324 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 30 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Franks | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Paczensky | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Drake | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Denton | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Franks | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Stephenson | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.23k | £86.28k | £121.20k | £134.15k | £148.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.96k | £85.87k | £118.71k | £138.48k | £140.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £74.19k | N/A | N/A | £93.89k | £136.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 July 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 July 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maidstone Skills Centre
Titchfield Road
Maidstone
Kent
ME15 8FX
- Phone:
- 01622 951170
- Email:
- sthilarys158@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window