BLISS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 19 May 1995: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND WORSHIP OF GOD. THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL, AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE, THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window