Financial history CANINE EPILEPSY SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1046436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.05k £12.95k £6.70k £9.75k £8.10k
Total expenditure £9.36k £8.45k £8.99k £8.28k £12.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A