Trustees 4TH EASTCOTE (ST.LAWRENCE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1046453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barry Chandler Chair 07 December 2022
None on record
Nikhil Patel Trustee 24 February 2025
None on record
Rupert Barton Trustee 06 January 2023
None on record
Sarah Radford Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Trevor James Hill Trustee 15 February 2020
None on record
Catherine McCarthy Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Louise Parkes Trustee 23 July 2016
None on record
Jennifer Smith Trustee 22 July 2016
None on record