Financial history OXSHOTT ROYALS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1046469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £73.71k £104.72k £94.43k £102.47k £168.20k
Total expenditure £116.69k £76.21k £129.10k £104.18k £196.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A