SWANSEA AND DISTRICT WRITERS CIRCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
encourage new writers in and around Swansea
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 17 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhian Burgess | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lakin Montez | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Thomas | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £652 | £747 | £1.01k | £1.62k | £2.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £1.18k | £394 | £1.72k | £2.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTRITUTION ADOPTED 3 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 1999 null
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF THE ART OF WRITING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CIRCLE HAS THE FOLLOWING POWERS: A) TO PUBLISH OCCASIONALLY A VOLUME OF MEMBER WORKS UNDER A TITLE TO BE AGREED AT THE TIME. B) TO CONDUCT MEETINGS AND ARRANGE LECTURES AND ADDRESSES. C) TO LIAISE AND COLABORATE WITH OTHER WRITERS' CIRCLES. D)TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS THAT ARE CONSIDERED NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECT."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 RHONDDA STREET
SWANSEA
SA1 6ER
- Phone:
- 01792550202
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window