CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the practice, appreciation and use of all forms of calligraphy and lettering arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 May 1995: Standard registration
- C L A S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Anne Hodgkinson | Chair | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Rosemary Allan | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Deeks | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ma Vita Perpetual Enriquez | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Bailey | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Cowan | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE WALKER | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE SUSAN BROWN | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JENNIFER WHOLLEY | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MEG MARGARET ELIZABETH CHAPMAN | Trustee | 07 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Alldred | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.05k | £57.05k | £76.64k | £65.27k | £69.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.38k | £53.25k | £96.63k | £71.08k | £75.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1998, 23 MARCH 2002 AND 17 MARCH 2007. as amended on 09 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE, APPRECIATION AND USE OF ALL FORMS OF CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Loweswater Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL51 3AZ
- Phone:
- 07792735717
- Email:
- admin@clas.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window