Governing document CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1046526

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1998, 23 MARCH 2002 AND 17 MARCH 2007. as amended on 09 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRACTICE, APPRECIATION AND USE OF ALL FORMS OF CALLIGRAPHY AND LETTERING ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.