Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF CONNAUGHT COURT

Charity number: 1046570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £22.60k £35.76k £30.03k £85.61k £35.61k
Total expenditure £26.33k £15.91k £30.20k £138.12k £47.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A