THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF CONNAUGHT COURT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND ELDERLY RESIDENTS AT CONNAUGHT COURT AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BY THE RECEIPT OF DONATIONS AND BY FUND RAISING EVENTS, ALLOWING FOR THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT FOR THE USE OF THE RESIDENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE DAILY ACTIVITIES OF THE RESIDENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE LOWIS | Chair |
|
||||||||
Martin Gaunt | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Batchelor | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN DAY | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Wadsworth | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Malcolm Brodie | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Priestley | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Barrie Graham | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Latham | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Neill Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Alexander Gilston | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
David Birkinshaw | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.60k | £35.76k | £30.03k | £85.61k | £35.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.33k | £15.91k | £30.20k | £138.12k | £47.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1995 AND AMENDED 4 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE SICK/ELDERLY RESIDENTS OF CONNAUGHT COURT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 COLVIN CLOSE
ARKSEY
DONCASTER
DN5 0TS
- Phone:
- 01302561136
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window