BRITISH DISABLED FENCING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the participation by people with a disability in the sport of fencing and to thereby assist their social integration, confidence and mental and physical wellbeing. British Disabled Fencing Association holds regional taster sessions, assists in finding appropriate local training facilities and organises monthly training weekends at either Stoke Mandeville or Moulton College, Northampton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 May 1995: Standard registration
- 18 May 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 May 2020: Funds transferred to 1187893 BRITISH DISABILITY FENCING
- BDFA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.14k | £101.22k | £101.53k | £36.62k | £70.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.95k | £93.16k | £105.41k | £44.00k | £69.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £90.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 14 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 14 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1994 AND AMENDED 6 MAY 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, SENSORY AND MENTAL DISABILITIES BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF FENCING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window