THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN FISHER SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money by holding both social and fundraising events at our school. The money we raise goes towards classroom and playground equipment. The main items purchased this year were technology for the school. Contributions are also made towards shortfalls on school trips, year 6 leavers bible, literacysupport and arts & crafts for school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 May 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Burke | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Allen | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Long | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Conboy | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Taaffe | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.19k | £28.32k | £33.72k | £23.68k | £4.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.21k | £41.92k | £41.21k | £19.58k | £21.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2023 | 582 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 January 2022 | 574 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 January 2022 | 574 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND FOSTER CO-OPERATION BETWEEN HOME AND SCHOOL FOR THE BENEFIT WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN.TO CONSIDER TOGETHER TOPICS OF INTREST AND CONCERN TO ALL THOSE WHO HAVE TO DEAL WITH THE CHILDREN. TO ORGANISED AND PROMOTE SUCH ACTIVITIES AND SOCIAL FUNCTIONS AS MAY BE DESIRABLE FOR THE WELL- BEING OF THE ASSOCIATION.TO RAISE FUNDS TO BE USED FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED ,IN PRACTICE PINNER,MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John Fisher School
Melrose Road
PINNER
HA5 5RA
- Phone:
- 020 8868 2961
- Website:
-
stjohnfisherschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window