ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational and community welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 23 May 1995: Standard registration
- MONKS PARK MASJID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD ATA-ULLAH | Chair | 26 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Rehmat Be Safdar BUTT | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hamida Begum ATA-ULLAH | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Safia JABBAR | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arif KAPADIA | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nazmudin Gulamhusein Habib VIRANI | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yasir Khan | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mustafa Jabbar Butt | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALTAF GODAL | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD MOHSIN ATA-ULLAH | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAQIB ILYAS BUTT | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SOLAD SAKANDAR MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
ARSHAD KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.29k | £396.70k | £248.95k | £390.90k | £279.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.38k | £230.74k | £192.40k | £212.31k | £204.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £27.24k | N/A | £49.80k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
02 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1995. as amended on 29 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION . TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISLAMIC CULTURE AND LANGUAGE AND THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE.TO RELIEVE THE POOR AND THE DISABLED.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF A PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -IN PRACTICE L.B.OF BRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 CECIL AVENUE
WEMBLEY
HA9 7DU
- Phone:
- 02089030786
- Email:
- icc.wembley@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window